Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0524)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Notice of Earned Income Tax Credits for Unemployment Insurance Claimants
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0655)
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Procedures for Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424 (SB0782)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 (SB0985)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0031)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0108)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Appeals and Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits Procedures - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0253)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1424)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution - Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985 (HB1454)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:15 PM
HB0031 (SB0256) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0108 (SB0524) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0234 Unemployment Insurance – Notice of Earned Income Tax Credits for Unemployment Insurance Claimants Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 (SB0655) Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 Unemployment Insurance - Procedures for Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits - Alterations Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1424 (SB0782) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 (SB0985) Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0177 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0031) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0524 (HB0108) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0635 Unemployment Insurance - Appeals and Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits Procedures - Revisions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0253) Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0782 (HB1424) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 Unemployment Insurance - Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution - Applicable Table of Rates Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0985 (HB1454) Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page