Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tuition

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024 /CH0209 (SB0004/CH0208)
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0607 (SB0332)
Title
Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 /CH0076 (SB0050/CH0075)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0566
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865
Title
Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (The Cameron Carden Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0799)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0208 (HB0024/CH0209)
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050 /CH0075 (HB0087/CH0076)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 (HB0054/CH0607)
Title
Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1102)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 /CH0209 (SB0004/CH0208) Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0054 /CH0607 (SB0332) Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Appropriations
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0087 /CH0076 (SB0050/CH0075) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0243 /CH0566 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0865 Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (The Cameron Carden Act of 2022) Delegate Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 (SB0799) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1156 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0004 /CH0208 (HB0024/CH0209) Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0050 /CH0075 (HB0087/CH0076) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0332 (HB0054/CH0607) Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Cost-of-Living Adjustment Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0799 (HB1102) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page