Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 (SB0126)
Title
Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0422)
Title
Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 /CH0204 (SB0579)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303
Title
Motor Vehicles - Emergency Commercial Driver's Licenses - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391 /CH0234
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0060)
Title
Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0750)
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB1150/CH0204)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 (SB0126) Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0750 (SB0422) Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1150 /CH0204 (SB0579) Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1303 Motor Vehicles - Emergency Commercial Driver's Licenses - Establishment Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 /CH0234 Clean Cars Act of 2022 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0060) Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0750) Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 (HB1150/CH0204) Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights Senator Bailey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:06 PM
Click to return on the top page