Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 (SB0148)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0460
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 /CH0450
Title
Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0066)
Title
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0118
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 (SB0148) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0250 /CH0460 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0626 /CH0450 Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 450
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0066) Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0291 /CH0118 Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page