Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0554
Title
Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0742
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 (SB0668)
Title
Juveniles – Truancy Reduction Pilot Program – Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0350 (SB0781)
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Enrollment Count – Average Daily Attendance
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0823)
Title
Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1018/CH0350)
Title
Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 /CH0554 Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 /CH0742 Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0823 (SB0668) Juveniles – Truancy Reduction Pilot Program – Expansion Delegate Clippinger 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 /CH0350 (SB0781) Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1045 Primary and Secondary Education – Enrollment Count – Average Daily Attendance Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0823) Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion Senator Smith 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0781 (HB1018/CH0350) Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page