Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0345 (SB0438/CH0346)
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0346 (HB0401/CH0345)
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 /CH0315 (SB0592/CH0316) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0401 /CH0345 (SB0438/CH0346) Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0461 Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1376 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
SB0438 /CH0346 (HB0401/CH0345) Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0592 /CH0316 (HB0258/CH0315) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:29 PM
Click to return on the top page