Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Tier 1 Renewable Source – Alterations (Reclaim Renewable Energy Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Tier 1 Renewable Source – Alterations (Reclaim Renewable Energy Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:35 AM
Click to return on the top page