Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 /CH0293 (SB0359/CH0294)
Title
Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0645
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 /CH0294 (HB0080/CH0293)
Title
Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 /CH0293 (SB0359/CH0294) Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0807 Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 /CH0645 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0359 /CH0294 (HB0080/CH0293) Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page