Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0502)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961
Title
Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0841)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0696 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0841 (SB0502) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0961 Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB0841) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page