Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transfer of Goods

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 /CH0294 (SB0261/CH0295)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0396)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0295 (HB0342/CH0294)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0211 Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0342 /CH0294 (SB0261/CH0295) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
HB0423 (SB0396) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019) Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0261 /CH0295 (HB0342/CH0294) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Operating Agreements and Partnership Agreements Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0339 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:55 AM
Click to return on the top page