Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Transfer of Goods

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229
Title
Corporate Income Tax – Throwback Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 (SB0420)
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0624)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Straw Purchase Participant Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0372)
Title
Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0638)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0229 Corporate Income Tax – Throwback Rule Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0372 (SB0420) Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0638 (SB0624) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0669 Crimes - Firearms - Straw Purchase Participant Penalty Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1291 Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0420 (HB0372) Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization Senator Carter 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0624 (HB0638) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/27/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page