Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transfer of Goods -see also- Goods&Svc; Leas&Rnt; RetailSale

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 (SB0263)
Title
Real Property Assessments – Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0081 (SB0284/CH0082)
Title
Natural Resources - Sale, Barter, or Exchange of Mounted Specimens From Decedent's Estate
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0472 (SB0055/CH0473)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0304)
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0028)
Title
Crimes and Corrections - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Valentine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Trade or Commerce Violations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0316)
Title
Crimes and Corrections - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 /CH0473 (HB0178/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0020)
Title
Real Property Assessments - Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0101
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0082 (HB0045/CH0081)
Title
Natural Resources - Sale, Barter, or Exchange of Mounted Specimens From Decedent's Estate
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 (HB0239)
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Motor Vehicles - Recreational Vehicle Dealer Agreements
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 (SB0263) Real Property Assessments – Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0021 Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0041 Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0045 /CH0081 (SB0284/CH0082) Natural Resources - Sale, Barter, or Exchange of Mounted Specimens From Decedent's Estate Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0178 /CH0472 (SB0055/CH0473) Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance Delegate Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0239 (SB0304) Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0294 Estates and Trusts - Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0316 (SB0028) Crimes and Corrections - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) Delegate Valentine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0868 Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Exemption for Trade-in Value of Portable Electronics Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1209 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Trade or Commerce Violations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 (HB0316) Crimes and Corrections - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0055 /CH0473 (HB0178/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0020) Real Property Assessments - Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0101 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0082 (HB0045/CH0081) Natural Resources - Sale, Barter, or Exchange of Mounted Specimens From Decedent's Estate Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2024 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 (HB0239) Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0350 Motor Vehicles - Recreational Vehicle Dealer Agreements Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page