Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0602 (SB0149/CH0601)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Insurer of Record - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0648 (SB0357)
Title
Out-of-State Motor Vehicles - Improper Registration - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 (SB0107)
Title
Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461 (SB0674/CH0560)
Title
Abandoned or Sunken Vessels and Waterway Improvement Fund Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495 (SB1164)
Title
Baltimore County - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Nawrocki
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0514)
Title
Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0601 (HB0176/CH0602)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal – Insurer of Record – Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0332/CH0648)
Title
Baltimore City - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0560 (HB1461)
Title
Abandoned or Sunken Vessels and Waterway Improvement Fund Grants
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1164 (HB1495)
Title
Baltimore County - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 /CH0602 (SB0149/CH0601) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Insurer of Record - Electronic Notification Delegate Foley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0332 /CH0648 (SB0357) Out-of-State Motor Vehicles - Improper Registration - Report Delegate Addison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0514 (SB0107) Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 (SB0674/CH0560) Abandoned or Sunken Vessels and Waterway Improvement Fund Grants Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1495 (SB1164) Baltimore County - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration Delegate Nawrocki 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 (HB0514) Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 /CH0601 (HB0176/CH0602) Vehicle Towing or Removal – Insurer of Record – Electronic Notification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 (HB0332/CH0648) Baltimore City - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 /CH0560 (HB1461) Abandoned or Sunken Vessels and Waterway Improvement Fund Grants Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1164 (HB1495) Baltimore County - Out-of-State Vehicles - Improper Registration Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2024 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page