Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0643
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0483 Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1330 Vehicle Laws - Towing Charges and Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0315 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 /CH0643 Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page