Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097)
Title
Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0430 (SB0296/CH0431)
Title
Land Use – Agritourism – Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0062 (SB0474/CH0063)
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0604
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096)
Title
Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 /CH0431 (HB0558/CH0430)
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0063 (HB0838/CH0062)
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0673)
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097) Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0558 /CH0430 (SB0296/CH0431) Land Use – Agritourism – Definition Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0673 Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0838 /CH0062 (SB0474/CH0063) Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0842 /CH0604 Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096) Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0296 /CH0431 (HB0558/CH0430) Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0474 /CH0063 (HB0838/CH0062) Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0538 (HB0673) Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page