Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0803)
Title
Economic Development – Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176 (SB0730)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 /CH0208 (SB0789/CH0209)
Title
Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1176)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208)
Title
Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB1144)
Title
Economic Development – Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0801 /CH0334 Calvert County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0803) Economic Development – Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund – Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1176 (SB0730) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1301 /CH0208 (SB0789/CH0209) Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/29/2021 - 9:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0730 (HB1176) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Expenses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208) Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation Senator McCray 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0803 (HB1144) Economic Development – Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund – Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page