Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 /CH0681 (SB0187/CH0682)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act – Definition of Local Government
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0602)
Title
Tort Claims Acts - Limits on Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0682 (HB0240/CH0681)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0721)
Title
Tort Claims Acts – Limits on Liability
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0240 /CH0681 (SB0187/CH0682) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0378 Local Government Tort Claims Act – Definition of Local Government Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0602) Tort Claims Acts - Limits on Liability Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0032 Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0187 /CH0682 (HB0240/CH0681) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0602 (HB0721) Tort Claims Acts – Limits on Liability Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0955 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc. Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page