Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tobacco and Nicotine -see also- Cigarettes; Smk&Vap

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 /CH0765 (SB0220/CH0766)
Title
Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0895 (SB0072/CH0896)
Title
Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 (SB0141)
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0754 (SB0244/CH0755)
Title
Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 303-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0582)
Title
Business Regulation - Cigarette, Other Tobacco Product, and Electronic Smoking Device Retailers - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Products (Make Quitting Convenient Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 (SB0987)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073
Title
Tobacco Tax - Cigarettes - Rate Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB1018)
Title
Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB1056/CH0462)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0896 (HB0147/CH0895)
Title
Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0199)
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0766 (HB0042/CH0765)
Title
Public Health – Public Health Services and Protections – Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 /CH0755 (HB0238/CH0754)
Title
Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0844)
Title
Business Regulation - Cigarette, Other Tobacco Product, and Electronic Smoking Device Retailers - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Products (Making Quitting Convenient Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB1033)
Title
Business Regulation – Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers – Certifications
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB1173)
Title
Tobacco Product Manufacturers – Escrow Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0462 (HB1180)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 /CH0765 (SB0220/CH0766) Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0147 /CH0895 (SB0072/CH0896) Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 895
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0199 (SB0141) Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Wu 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0238 /CH0754 (SB0244/CH0755) Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0374 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 303-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0844 (SB0582) Business Regulation - Cigarette, Other Tobacco Product, and Electronic Smoking Device Retailers - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Products (Make Quitting Convenient Act) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 (SB0987) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1073 Tobacco Tax - Cigarettes - Rate Alteration Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 (SB1018) Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
HB1180 (SB1056/CH0462) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1197 Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0896 (HB0147/CH0895) Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 896
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0141 (HB0199) Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0220 /CH0766 (HB0042/CH0765) Public Health – Public Health Services and Protections – Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 /CH0755 (HB0238/CH0754) Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB0844) Business Regulation - Cigarette, Other Tobacco Product, and Electronic Smoking Device Retailers - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Products (Making Quitting Convenient Act) Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 (HB1033) Business Regulation – Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers – Certifications Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB1173) Tobacco Product Manufacturers – Escrow Act – Alterations Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1056 /CH0462 (HB1180) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024) Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page