Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 (SB0099)
Title
Hate Crimes – Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 /CH0253 (SB0004/CH0254)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380 (SB0957)
Title
Criminal Law – Threat Against Public Health Official
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0254 (HB0363/CH0253)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 (HB0286)
Title
Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867
Title
Criminal Law – Hate Crimes – First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB1380)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0198 Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0286 (SB0099) Hate Crimes – Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0363 /CH0253 (SB0004/CH0254) Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0924 Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1380 (SB0957) Criminal Law – Threat Against Public Health Official Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 /CH0254 (HB0363/CH0253) Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0099 (HB0286) Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0848 Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 Criminal Law – Hate Crimes – First Responders Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0953 Domestic Terrorism Task Force Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB1380) Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page