Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Theft -see also- Burglary; Robbery; Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0895 (SB0072/CH0896)
Title
Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0039)
Title
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0373)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Mail Depository Key
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 (SB0378)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Juvenile Law - Expedited Pretrial Status Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Packages (Porch Piracy Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948
Title
Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0930)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0628
Title
Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Public Safety - Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 (HB0304)
Title
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0896 (HB0147/CH0895)
Title
Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100
Title
Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0318)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Arrow Key
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 (HB0659)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Losses From Theft or Fraud
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB1156)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1097
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0059 Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 /CH0895 (SB0072/CH0896) Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 895
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0304 (SB0039) Gun Theft Felony Act of 2024 Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0318 (SB0373) Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Mail Depository Key Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0659 (SB0378) Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0927 Juvenile Law - Expedited Pretrial Status Hearing Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0946 Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Packages (Porch Piracy Act of 2024) Delegate Toles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft Delegate Toles 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1156 (SB0930) Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0628 Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1428 Public Safety - Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Restoration of Benefits Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1437 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0039 (HB0304) Gun Theft Felony Act of 2024 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0896 (HB0147/CH0895) Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 896
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0100 Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 (HB0318) Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Arrow Key Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 (HB0659) Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Losses From Theft or Fraud Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 (HB1156) Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1097 Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page