Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0396)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Criminal Law - Package Theft (Defense Against Porch Pirates Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB0619)
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Financial Institutions - Decentralized Financial Regulatory Sandbox Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0162)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB1410)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285
Title
Election Law - Campaign Signs - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0423)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB1173)
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0423 (SB0396) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Criminal Law - Package Theft (Defense Against Porch Pirates Act) Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1132 Gun Theft Felony Act of 2022 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 (SB0619) Organized Retail Theft Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1204 Financial Institutions - Decentralized Financial Regulatory Sandbox Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1410 (SB0162) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0013 Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0162 (HB1410) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 Election Law - Campaign Signs - Prohibitions Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0423) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 (HB1173) Organized Retail Theft Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2022 10:54 AM
Click to return on the top page