Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758
Title
Education – Public Schools – Lesson Plans and Instructional Material
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Curriculum Publication
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287
Title
Public Schools - Curricula and Instructional Materials - Required List of Information (Curriculum Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786
Title
Education - Public Schools - Curriculum Publication (Curriculum Transparency and Publication Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0758 Education – Public Schools – Lesson Plans and Instructional Material Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0826 Baltimore County - Board of Education - Curriculum Publication Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1156 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1287 Public Schools - Curricula and Instructional Materials - Required List of Information (Curriculum Transparency Act of 2022) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0786 Education - Public Schools - Curriculum Publication (Curriculum Transparency and Publication Act) Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 4:02 PM
Click to return on the top page