Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Tax–Free Period for Back–to–School Shopping – School Supplies and Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0904)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 (HB0792)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0266 Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0380 Sales and Use Tax – Tax–Free Period for Back–to–School Shopping – School Supplies and Textbooks Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0792 (SB0904) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1113 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 (HB0792) Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page