Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Testimony -see also- Witnesses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0568)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 /CH0989 (SB1038/CH0990)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0330)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 /CH0990 (HB1093/CH0989)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0141 Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0273 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0330 (SB0568) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB1093 /CH0989 (SB1038/CH0990) Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 989
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 836
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0568 (HB0330) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 /CH0990 (HB1093/CH0989) Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 990
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page