Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Testimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 (SB0078)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 /CH0486
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0221)
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings – Grand Jury – Transcription of Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0072)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0402)
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Actions - Considered Judgment of Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 (SB0078) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0210 /CH0486 Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0221) Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Courts and Judicial Proceedings – Grand Jury – Transcription of Testimony Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Maryland Parental Rights Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0953 Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0078 (HB0072) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0221 (HB0402) Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority President 6 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0889 Family Law - Child Custody Actions - Considered Judgment of Minor Children Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page