Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Telework

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0696 (SB0710)
Title
State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Computer Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 /CH0632 (SB0824/CH0633)
Title
Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB0073/CH0696)
Title
State and Local Government and Private Employers - Teleworking
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0633 (HB1328/CH0632)
Title
Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 /CH0696 (SB0710) State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking Delegate Krimm 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
4/06/2021 - 2:50 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1230 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Computer Equipment Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1328 /CH0632 (SB0824/CH0633) Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Economic Matters
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 (HB0073/CH0696) State and Local Government and Private Employers - Teleworking Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 /CH0633 (HB1328/CH0632) Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021) Senator Hester 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page