Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213 (SB0189)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0432
Title
Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0213)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0213 (SB0189) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0684 /CH0432 Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0189 (HB0213) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page