Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Supreme Court of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048
Title
Courts - Justices and Judges - Selection and Retention
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Districting - Single Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 /CH0945 (SB0623/CH0946)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 /CH0301 (SB0518/CH0302)
Title
Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286
Title
Task Force on Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 /CH0878 (SB0111/CH0877)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 /CH0353 (SB0494)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0602)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0877 (HB0458/CH0878)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 (HB0471/CH0353)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 /CH0302 (HB0285/CH0301)
Title
Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0658)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 /CH0946 (HB0209/CH0945)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865
Title
Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 Courts - Justices and Judges - Selection and Retention Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Judiciary
Ways and Means
HB0087 Criminal Law - Death Penalty Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 Districting - Single Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0209 /CH0945 (SB0623/CH0946) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 945
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0285 /CH0301 (SB0518/CH0302) Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0286 Task Force on Common Ownership Communities Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 /CH0878 (SB0111/CH0877) Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 878
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0471 /CH0353 (SB0494) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Delegate Fair 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0658 (SB0602) Criminal Procedure – Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0111 /CH0877 (HB0458/CH0878) Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 877
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0494 (HB0471/CH0353) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 /CH0302 (HB0285/CH0301) Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations Senator Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0602 (HB0658) Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024) Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 /CH0946 (HB0209/CH0945) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 946
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page