Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0271 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0968 Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page