Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0454)
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366 /CH0594
Title
District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697
Title
Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 /CH0595
Title
Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0454) Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0366 /CH0594 District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0697 Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1070 Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0862 /CH0595 Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page