Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0082)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0088)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 (SB0922)
Title
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0809)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198
Title
Public Health - Abortion - Drug-Induced Abortions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 (HB0233)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 (HB0304)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1188)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB0756)
Title
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lam
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0233 (SB0082) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0304 (SB0088) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0367 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0756 (SB0922) Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1188 (SB0809) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1198 Public Health - Abortion - Drug-Induced Abortions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 (HB0233) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0088 (HB0304) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0809 (HB1188) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0922 (HB0756) Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse Senator Lam 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Appropriations
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page