Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator and Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569 (SB0418)
Title
Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 (SB0676)
Title
Firearm Safety - Storage Requirements and Youth Suicide Prevention (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0565)
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 /CH0760
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - University and College Hospitality Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0055
Title
Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0246
Title
Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0569)
Title
Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0800)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
State Building Code - Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB0659)
Title
Firearm Safety – Storage Requirements and Youth Suicide Prevention (Jaelynn’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0384 Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator and Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policies Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0569 (SB0418) Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0659 (SB0676) Firearm Safety - Storage Requirements and Youth Suicide Prevention (Jaelynn's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0565) Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 /CH0760 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - University and College Hospitality Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0055 Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0246 Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0569) Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0800) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 State Building Code - Electric Vehicles Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB0659) Firearm Safety – Storage Requirements and Youth Suicide Prevention (Jaelynn’s Law) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:29 PM
Click to return on the top page