Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109
Title
Criminal Law - Misdemeanor Theft - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0038)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Statute of Limitations and Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0195)
Title
Family Law – Child Support
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 (SB0533)
Title
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268 (SB0981)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance and Collection of Debts - Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269
Title
Criminal Law - Petty Theft - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0194 (SB0413)
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts - Limitation Periods
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456
Title
Civil Actions - Child Nonsexual Abuse and Neglect - Damages and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0608/CH0114)
Title
Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petitions and Immigration Enforcement at Sensitive Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Statute of Limitations - Prosecution or Enforcement of Local Consumer Protection Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0159 (SB0421/CH0158)
Title
Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Intercepted Communications - Statute of Limitations and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112
Title
PFAS Chemicals - Civil Actions and Prohibition on Consumer Product Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 /CH0104
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Civil Actions - Nonprofit Organizations - Unauthorized Support of Israeli Settlement Activity (Not On Our Dime Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 (HB0218)
Title
Family Law - Child Support
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 /CH0158 (HB0616/CH0159)
Title
Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443
Title
Trafficking Regulated Firearms - Felony Classification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0238)
Title
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 /CH0114 (HB0579)
Title
Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petitions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 Criminal Law - Misdemeanor Theft - Statute of Limitations Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0130 (SB0038) Intercepted Communications - Statute of Limitations and Penalty Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 (SB0195) Family Law – Child Support Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0238 (SB0533) Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0268 (SB0981) Hospitals - Financial Assistance and Collection of Debts - Policies Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0269 Criminal Law - Petty Theft - Statute of Limitations Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0194 (SB0413) Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts - Limitation Periods Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Economic Matters
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 Civil Actions - Child Nonsexual Abuse and Neglect - Damages and Statute of Limitations Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 (SB0608/CH0114) Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petitions and Immigration Enforcement at Sensitive Locations Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0591 Statute of Limitations - Prosecution or Enforcement of Local Consumer Protection Codes Delegate Embry 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0159 (SB0421/CH0158) Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Judiciary
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0706 Intercepted Communications - Statute of Limitations and Penalties Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 PFAS Chemicals - Civil Actions and Prohibition on Consumer Product Sales Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1378 /CH0104 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1394 Civil Actions - Nonprofit Organizations - Unauthorized Support of Israeli Settlement Activity (Not On Our Dime Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0195 (HB0218) Family Law - Child Support Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 /CH0158 (HB0616/CH0159) Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2025 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 Trafficking Regulated Firearms - Felony Classification Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
SB0533 (HB0238) Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 /CH0114 (HB0579) Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petitions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2025 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page