Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 (SB0730)
Title
Estates and Trusts – Claims Against an Estate – Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Police Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Sexual Abuse – Reporting and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156
Title
Civil Actions - Specialties - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0435
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With a Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0991)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0802)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Claims Against an Estate - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0463 Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 (SB0730) Estates and Trusts – Claims Against an Estate – Statute of Limitations Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1012 Police Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 Health Care Practitioners – Sexual Abuse – Reporting and Statute of Limitations Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0156 Civil Actions - Specialties - Statute of Limitations Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0435 Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With a Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 (HB0991) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB0802) Estates and Trusts - Claims Against an Estate - Statute of Limitations Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page