Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 (SB0134)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353
Title
Civil Actions - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916)
Title
Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Courts – COVID–19 – Statutory Deadlines
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB0263)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 /CH0311
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911
Title
Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515)
Title
Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0263 (SB0134) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0353 Civil Actions - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916) Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1216 Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1354 Courts – COVID–19 – Statutory Deadlines Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0134 (HB0263) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0145 Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0327 /CH0311 Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0911 Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515) Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0918 Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:16 PM
Click to return on the top page