Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

State Police, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Law Enforcement – Department of State Police – Body–Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Public Safety – Task Force on Missing Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0089 (SB0366/CH0088)
Title
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0826)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 /CH0722 (SB0299/CH0723)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0624)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0863)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0060
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 /CH0090
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Handgun Permit – Preliminary Approval
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 /CH0088 (HB0441/CH0089)
Title
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0638)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0538)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1082)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0152 Law Enforcement – Department of State Police – Body–Worn Cameras Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0305 Public Safety – Task Force on Missing Persons Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0441 /CH0089 (SB0366/CH0088) Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0538 (SB0826) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0548 /CH0722 (SB0299/CH0723) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0638 (SB0624) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0773 Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0791 Military Service Credit - Eligibility Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1082 (SB0863) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0015 Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0071 /CH0060 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force Senator Sydnor 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 60
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0156 /CH0090 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0309 Handgun Permit – Preliminary Approval Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0366 /CH0088 (HB0441/CH0089) Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0624 (HB0638) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB0538) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0863 (HB1082) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page