Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066)
Title
Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency and Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065)
Title
Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066) Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1473 State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency and Individuals With Disabilities Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2025 - 2:45 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/03/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065) Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2025 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page