Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0948 Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288) Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page