Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0361/CH0720)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH1026 (SB1100/CH1027)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0982/CH0497)
Title
Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0410
Title
Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 /CH0403
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0720 (HB0351)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0497 (HB1188)
Title
Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0351 (SB0361/CH0720) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB1052 /CH1026 (SB1100/CH1027) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1026
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1188 (SB0982/CH0497) Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Budget and Taxation
HB1524 /CH0410 Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1525 /CH0403 Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/06/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0361 /CH0720 (HB0351) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2024, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0982 /CH0497 (HB1188) Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 11:15 AM
Click to return on the top page