Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 (SB0666/CH0344)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Monetary Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH1008
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH1017 (SB0770/CH1018)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788
Title
Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Criminal Records
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 /CH0163 (SB1024)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Middle and High Schools - Venue-Specific Emergency Action Plans for Athletic Facilities (The Bailey Bullock Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 /CH0403
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Education - Public High School Athletic and Physical Education Facilities - Study
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0344 (HB0368)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Monetary Relief
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 /CH1018 (HB0742/CH1017)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Stadium License
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH1025 (HB0920/CH1024)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 /CH1016
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing Fees
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 (HB1219/CH0163)
Title
Public Middle and High Schools - Cardiac Emergency Response Plans for Athletic Facilities (The Bailey Bullock Act)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1184 /CH1047
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - College Athletic Event Venue Concessionaire Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0368 (SB0666/CH0344) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Monetary Relief Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0621 /CH1008 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1008
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH1017 (SB0770/CH1018) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1017
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0788 Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Criminal Records Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1024
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1219 /CH0163 (SB1024) Public and Nonpublic Middle and High Schools - Venue-Specific Emergency Action Plans for Athletic Facilities (The Bailey Bullock Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1525 /CH0403 Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/06/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0021 Education - Public High School Athletic and Physical Education Facilities - Study Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0666 /CH0344 (HB0368) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Monetary Relief Senator Charles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0770 /CH1018 (HB0742/CH1017) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Stadium License Frederick County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1018
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0853 /CH1025 (HB0920/CH1024) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1025
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0895 /CH1016 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing Fees Senator Carter 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1016
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 (HB1219/CH0163) Public Middle and High Schools - Cardiac Emergency Response Plans for Athletic Facilities (The Bailey Bullock Act) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1184 /CH1047 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - College Athletic Event Venue Concessionaire Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1047
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page