Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0345/CH0603)
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376 /CH0372
Title
Study on the Feasibility of Relocating the Prince George's County Public School System Headquarters PG 501-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0238 (SB0114/CH0237)
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615)
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334 /CH0335
Title
Housing and Community Development – Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund – Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0618)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Community Development Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0410
Title
Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 /CH0403
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0237 (HB0515/CH0238)
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 (HB1416)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Master Plan
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 /CH0615 (HB0741/CH0616)
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0344 (SB0345/CH0603) Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0376 /CH0372 Study on the Feasibility of Relocating the Prince George's County Public School System Headquarters PG 501-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0515 /CH0238 (SB0114/CH0237) Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools Delegate Long, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Appropriations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615) Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116) State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1334 /CH0335 Housing and Community Development – Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund – Extension Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1416 (SB0618) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Community Development Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB1524 /CH0410 Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1525 /CH0403 Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/06/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0114 /CH0237 (HB0515/CH0238) Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0618 (HB1416) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Master Plan Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0804 /CH0615 (HB0741/CH0616) Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study Senator Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page