Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Applicability of Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0926/CH0353)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 /CH0353 (HB1162)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 Maryland Stadium Authority – Applicability of Prevailing Wage Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1162 (SB0926/CH0353) Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0926 /CH0353 (HB1162) Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page