Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Special Events

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 /CH0759
Title
Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0550/CH0478)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0673)
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0281 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0550 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269) Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 /CH0759 Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 767
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0550/CH0478) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0538 (HB0673) Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658) Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page