Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0338)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 /CH0984 (SB0807/CH0985)
Title
Somerset County – Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 /CH0986 (SB0829/CH0987)
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 /CH0698 (SB0763/CH0699)
Title
Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0443)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0699 (HB0977/CH0698)
Title
Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 /CH0985 (HB0975/CH0984)
Title
Somerset County - Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0987 (HB0976/CH0986)
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0443 (SB0338) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 /CH0984 (SB0807/CH0985) Somerset County – Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 984
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0976 /CH0986 (SB0829/CH0987) Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 986
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0977 /CH0698 (SB0763/CH0699) Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0338 (HB0443) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0763 /CH0699 (HB0977/CH0698) Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0807 /CH0985 (HB0975/CH0984) Somerset County - Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 985
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0987 (HB0976/CH0986) Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 987
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page