Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0389 (SB0098)
Title
Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214)
Title
Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614)
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 /CH0758 (SB0495)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0143/CH0389)
Title
Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213)
Title
Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613)
Title
Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB0671/CH0758)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 /CH0389 (SB0098) Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214) Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/16/2022 - 10:00 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614) Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 /CH0758 (SB0495) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0098 (HB0143/CH0389) Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213) Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613) Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0495 (HB0671/CH0758) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abolishment of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary System Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page