Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 (SB0634)
Title
Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 (HB0840)
Title
Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0840 (SB0634) Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0634 (HB0840) Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:42 PM
Click to return on the top page