Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0109
Title
Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806
Title
Building Standards and Emissions Reductions – High Performance, State, and Local Government Buildings, State Operations, and Eligible Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961
Title
Public Projects – Global Warming Potential of Materials (Buy Clean Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0109 Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0498 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0806 Building Standards and Emissions Reductions – High Performance, State, and Local Government Buildings, State Operations, and Eligible Projects Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022 Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0961 Public Projects – Global Warming Potential of Materials (Buy Clean Maryland Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:09 AM
Click to return on the top page