Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Solicitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 (SB0361)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0632)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 /CH0078 (SB0598/CH0079)
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Election Law - Prohibition of Solicitation to Commit Election Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0829)
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327
Title
Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0312
Title
Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0485)
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598 /CH0079 (HB0790/CH0078)
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB1091)
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0485 (SB0361) Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0515 Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0600 /CH0711 (SB0523/CH0712) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0761 (SB0632) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0790 /CH0078 (SB0598/CH0079) Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0949 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1030 State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB1085 Election Law - Prohibition of Solicitation to Commit Election Crime Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1091 (SB0829) State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1327 Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0296 Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0353 /CH0312 Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0361 (HB0485) Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0374 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0523 /CH0712 (HB0600/CH0711) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees Senator Lam 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0598 /CH0079 (HB0790/CH0078) Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0829 (HB1091) State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page