Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0135)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0171)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0171 (SB0135) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0171) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0601 Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page