Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0585)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0455)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 /CH0621
Title
Baltimore City - Soil Conservation District - Authority to Establish
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0455 (SB0585) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0585 (HB0455) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0616 /CH0621 Baltimore City - Soil Conservation District - Authority to Establish Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page